KS SB124 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 21, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 21, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending factors considered in determinations of child custody, residency and parenting time; clarifying admissibility of certain tests for drugs or alcohol in proceedings under the revised Kansas code for care of children.
Title
Amending factors considered in determinations of child custody, residency and parenting time; clarifying admissibility of certain tests for drugs or alcohol in proceedings under the revised Kansas code for care of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 21, 2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2017 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Finch, Representative Patton and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Wilborn , Senator Lynn and Senator Haley as conferees |
2017-03-29 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 125 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-02-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |