KS SB120 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 24, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 24, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updating the code of civil procedure.
Title
Updating the code of civil procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2017-05-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Finch, Representative Patton and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Wilborn , Senator Lynn and Senator Haley as conferees |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-04-07 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2017-04-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2017-04-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2017-04-06 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-03 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-09 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 09, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-02-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |