KS SB119 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Encouraging judicial districts to establish and utilize specialty courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging judicial districts to establish and utilize specialty courts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-07SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-06SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback