KS SB118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting counties from debts or obligations of a county hospital upon its closure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting counties from debts or obligations of a county hospital upon its closure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-02-07SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-06SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback