KS SB115 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the office of the child advocate as an independent state agency and prescribing certain powers, duties and functions thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the office of the child advocate as an independent state agency and prescribing certain powers, duties and functions thereof.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 117 Nay: 3 (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 3 (Y: 120 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2024
2024-04-25SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024
2024-04-04SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 3
2024-04-04HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 117 Nay: 3
2024-04-04HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2023-03-29HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Concannon, Representative Johnson and Representative Ousley appointed as conferees
2023-03-28SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson as conferees
2023-03-27HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 3
2023-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2023-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2023-03-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care
2023-03-15HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
2023-02-22HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care
2023-02-22HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2023-02-22SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2023-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2023-02-15SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2023-02-08SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 8, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2023-01-30SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-01-27SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/sb115/
Texthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/sb115_00_0000.pdf
Texthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/sb115_01_0000.pdf
Texthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/sb115_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/cr_2023_sb115_s_1204.pdf
Amendmenthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/cr_2023_sb115_h_1751.pdf
Amendmenthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/ccr_2024_sb115_h_3914.pdf
Supplementhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/fisc_note_sb115_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/supp_note_sb115_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/supp_note_sb115_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/ccrb_sb115_01_childadvocate.pdf
Roll Callhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230222153408_965672/
Roll Callhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230327163621_572770/
Roll Callhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20240404175818_764967/
Roll Callhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20240404230158_037473/

Bill Comments

feedback