KS SB105 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 8, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Elections; cities; date for taking office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; cities; date for taking office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 8, 2019
2019-04-01SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 1, 2019
2019-03-25HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2019-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Elections
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2019-02-14SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 14, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 142-S
2019-02-07SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2019-02-06SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback