KS SB100 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 100 by Committee on Transportation – Excluding the additional 90-day wait period driver’s license suspension for certain offenses.
Title
Substitute for SB 100 by Committee on Transportation – Excluding the additional 90-day wait period driver’s license suspension for certain offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED |
2021-04-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-04-06 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Introduced |