KS SB10 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting filing of certain liens or claims against real or personal property and providing for criminal penalties.
Title
Prohibiting filing of certain liens or claims against real or personal property and providing for criminal penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs and re-referred to Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 19, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |