KS S0545 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Employment security; benefits. Effective date: KS Reg.
Title
Employment security; benefits. Effective date: KS Reg.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Business and Labor -SJ 1023; Hearing: 2/16/2010, Tues., 8:30 am, Rm 548-S | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced -SJ 1013 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |