KS S0543 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in Senate
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in Senate
Summary
Authorizing a program to certain telecommunications carriers. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Authorizing a program to certain telecommunications carriers. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died on General Orders in Senate | |
2010-03-16 | Hearing: Wed., 3/17/2010, 9:00 AM, Rm 785 Docking | |
2010-03-11 | CR: Be passed as am. by Utilities -SJ 1175 | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Utilities -SJ 1023 | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced -SJ 1013 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |