KS S0540 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Kansas underground utilities damage prevention act; one-call liability changes. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Kansas underground utilities damage prevention act; one-call liability changes. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-15 | Hearing: 2/17/2010, Wed., 1:30 pm, Rm 548-S | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Utilities -SJ 1013 | |
2010-02-10 | Introduced -SJ 1006 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |