KS S0247 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Summary
Children in need of care; grandparent costs; continuing education requirements for guardians ad litem, others. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Children in need of care; grandparent costs; continuing education requirements for guardians ad litem, others. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died on General Orders in House | |
2010-03-23 | CR: Substitute be passed by Federal and State Affairs -HJ 1238; Substitute introduced & placed on General Orders -HJ 1238 | |
2010-03-10 | Hearing: Tues., 3/16/2010, 1:30 PM, Rm 346-S | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Federal and State Affairs -HJ 367 | |
2009-03-20 | Received and introduced -HJ 351 | |
2009-03-19 | FA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 359 | |
2009-03-18 | COW: Be passed -SJ 349 | |
2009-03-13 | CR: Be passed by Federal and State Affairs -SJ 317 | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Federal and State Affairs -SJ 139 | |
2009-02-09 | Introduced -SJ 127 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |