KS S0245 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Allowing publication of a summary of a city ordinance. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Allowing publication of a summary of a city ordinance. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2009-03-09 | Hearing: 3/10/2009, Tues, 9:30 am, Rm 446-N | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Local Government -SJ 139 | |
2009-02-09 | Introduced -SJ 126 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |