KS HR6061 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Enrolled on Friday, May 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Enrolled on Friday, May 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designating April 29 through May 5, 2018, as Senior Corps Week at the Capitol.
Title
Designating April 29 through May 5, 2018, as Senior Corps Week at the Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Enrolled on Friday, May 04, 2018 |
2018-04-30 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2018-04-30 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hr6061/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hr6061_enrolled.pdf |