KS HR6050 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-10)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, March 13, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Strengthening the sister-state relations between the State of Kansas and Taiwan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strengthening the sister-state relations between the State of Kansas and Taiwan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13HouseHouse Enrolled on Tuesday, March 13, 2018
2018-03-08HouseHouse Adopted without roll call
2018-03-05HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback