KS HR6043 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Enrolled on Thursday, February 15, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Enrolled on Thursday, February 15, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution urging the Federal Aviation Administration to accept Kansas’ application for the Unmanned Aerial Systems Integration Pilot Program.
Title
A resolution urging the Federal Aviation Administration to accept Kansas’ application for the Unmanned Aerial Systems Integration Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Sen. J.R. Claeys [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | House Enrolled on Thursday, February 15, 2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2018-01-30 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hr6043/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hr6043_enrolled.pdf |