KS HR6026 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, June 02, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, June 02, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urging U.S. Congress and POTUS to sign the Toxic Exposure Research Act of 2015 into law.
Title
Urging U.S. Congress and POTUS to sign the Toxic Exposure Research Act of 2015 into law.
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Boldra [R] | Rep. Mario Goico [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - House Final Action - Adopted as amended - Yea: 109 Nay: 2 (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | House | House Enrolled on Tuesday, June 02, 2015 |
2015-05-31 | House | House Final Action - Adopted as amended; Yea: 109 Nay: 2 |
2015-05-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended |
2015-05-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-05-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted as amended by Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security |
2015-05-19 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, May 20, 2015, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2015-05-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security |
2015-05-18 | House | House Introduced |