KS HR6016 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-13)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - House Enrolled on Thursday, May 6, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designating May 3, 2021, as Michael Mosher Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating May 3, 2021, as Michael Mosher Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HouseHouse Enrolled on Thursday, May 6, 2021
2021-05-03HouseHouse Adopted without roll call
2021-05-03HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback