KS HR6014 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - House Enrolled on Thursday, March 05, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - House Enrolled on Thursday, March 05, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the 44th Wichita Riverfest.
Title
Recognizing the 44th Wichita Riverfest.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Hawkins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | House Enrolled on Thursday, March 05, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2015-02-20 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hr6014/ |
Text | http://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hr6014_enrolled.pdf |