KS HR6010 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - House Enrolled on Monday, March 15, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting the United States Army Future Vertical Lift program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting the United States Army Future Vertical Lift program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-15HouseHouse Enrolled on Monday, March 15, 2021
2021-03-02HouseHouse Adopted without roll call
2021-03-01HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback