KS HR6010 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 66-20)
Status: Passed on February 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, February 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 66-20)
Status: Passed on February 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, February 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing February 7, 2019, as JAG-K day at the capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 7, 2019, as JAG-K day at the capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | House Enrolled on Tuesday, February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-07 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2019-02-07 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hr6010/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hr6010_enrolled.pdf |