KS HR6008 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on February 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-10 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, February 10, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on February 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-10 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, February 10, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorating the 150th Anniversary of Washburn University in Topeka, Kansas.
Title
Commemorating the 150th Anniversary of Washburn University in Topeka, Kansas.
Sponsors
Rep. Annie Kuether [D] | Rep. John Alcala [D] | Rep. Ken Corbet [R] | Rep. Dick Jones [R] |
Rep. Ramon Gonzalez [R] | Rep. Lane Hemsley [R] | Rep. Ron Highland [R] | Rep. Fred Patton [R] |
Rep. Anna Tietze [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | House Enrolled on Tuesday, February 10, 2015 |
2015-02-06 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2015-02-04 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hr6008/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hr6008_enrolled.pdf |