KS HR6004 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - House Enrolled on Friday, January 29, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adopting permanent rules of the House of Representatives for the 2021-2022 biennium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting permanent rules of the House of Representatives for the 2021-2022 biennium.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-29HouseHouse Enrolled on Friday, January 29, 2021
2021-01-22HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, January 21, 2021
2021-01-21HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Adopted as amended; Yea: 110 Nay: 12
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Handwritten amendment by Representative Parker was rejected. Yea: 46 Nay: 75
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Handwritten motion to amend - Offered by Representative Parker
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ousley was rejected.
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ousley
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Probst was rejected.
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Probst
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carpenter, B. was adopted
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carpenter, B.
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Rhiley was rejected.
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Rhiley
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-01-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted as amended by Committee on Rules and Journal
2021-01-19HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, January 19, 2021, 12:00 PM Room 582-N
2021-01-11HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Rules and Journal
2021-01-11HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/hr6004/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hr6004_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hr6004_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hr6004_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hr6004_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hr6004_h_0601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hr6004_h_0585.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hr6004_h_0611.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hr6004_h_0616.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210121125424_177976/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210121155546_736274/

Bill Comments 750

feedback