KS HR6002 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-20 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, January 20, 2015
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-20 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, January 20, 2015
Summary
Assignment of seats in House of Representatives, 2015.
Title
Assignment of seats in House of Representatives, 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-20 | House | House Enrolled on Tuesday, January 20, 2015 |
2015-01-14 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, January 13 , 2015 |
2015-01-12 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2015-01-12 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li_2016/b2015_16/measures/hr6002/ |