KS HCR5030 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee

Summary

Adjournment of the senate and house of representatives for a period of time during the 2018 regular session of the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjournment of the senate and house of representatives for a period of time during the 2018 regular session of the legislature.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Died in Senate Committee
2018-04-27SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Organization, Calendar and Rules
2018-04-26SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2018-04-07HouseHouse Adopted without roll call
2018-04-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback