KS HCR5019 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the bill of rights of the constitution of the state of Kansas to reserve to the people the right to regulate abortion through their elected state representatives and senators.
Title
Amending the bill of rights of the constitution of the state of Kansas to reserve to the people the right to regulate abortion through their elected state representatives and senators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | House Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by |
2020-01-21 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 21, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2020-01-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-01-16 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hcr5019/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hcr5019_00_0000.pdf |