KS HCR5015 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - House Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, April 8, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Congress to reject the For the People Act of 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging the United States Congress to reject the For the People Act of 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 28 Nay: 11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Final Action - Adopted as amended - Yea: 84 Nay: 38 (Y: 84 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Parker was rejected - Yea: 39 Nay: 83 (Y: 39 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, April 8, 2021
2021-03-30SenateSenate Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 28 Nay: 11
2021-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
2021-03-25SenateSenate Referred to Committee of the Whole
2021-03-24SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2021-03-24HouseHouse Final Action - Adopted as amended; Yea: 84 Nay: 38
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Parker was rejected Yea: 39 Nay: 83
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Parker
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-03-18HouseHouse Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted as amended by Committee on Elections
2021-03-11HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 11, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
2021-03-10HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Elections
2021-03-10HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/hcr5015/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hcr5015_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hcr5015_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hcr5015_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_hcr5015_h_1758.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hcr5015_h_1849.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hcr5015_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/summary_hcr_5015_2021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210323115114_688248/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210324112553_581207/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210330143245_589637/

Bill Comments 750

feedback