KS HCR5003 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - House Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, February 4, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the bill of rights of the constitution of the state of Kansas to reserve to the people the right to regulate abortion through their elected state representatives and senators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the bill of rights of the constitution of the state of Kansas to reserve to the people the right to regulate abortion through their elected state representatives and senators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Adopted by required 2/3 majority - Yea: 28 Nay: 11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 27 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 26 (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 27 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 86 Nay: 38 (Y: 86 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House EFA Subject to Amendment and Debate - Amendment by Representative Ballard was rejected. - Yea: 38 Nay: 86 (Y: 38 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-22 - House - House EFA Subject to Amendment and Debate - Amendment by Representative Probst was rejected. - Yea: 40 Nay: 84 (Y: 40 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, February 4, 2021
2021-01-28SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Adopted by required 2/3 majority; Yea: 28 Nay: 11
2021-01-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
2021-01-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected Yea: 11 Nay: 27
2021-01-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
2021-01-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was rejected Yea: 11 Nay: 26
2021-01-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Doll
2021-01-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected Yea: 11 Nay: 27
2021-01-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey
2021-01-22SenateSenate Referred to the Committee of the Whole
2021-01-22SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2021-01-22HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 86 Nay: 38
2021-01-22HouseHouse EFA Subject to Amendment and Debate - Motion to amend offered by Representative Miller.
2021-01-22HouseHouse EFA Subject to Amendment and Debate - Amendment by Representative Ballard was rejected. Yea: 38 Nay: 86
2021-01-22HouseHouse EFA Subject to Amendment and Debate - Motion to Amend - Offerd by Representative Ballard
2021-01-22HouseHouse EFA Subject to Amendment and Debate - Ruling of the chair was sustained.
2021-01-22HouseHouse EFA Subject to Amendment and Debate - Amendment by Representative Carmicheal ruled non-germane.
2021-01-22HouseHouse EFA Subject to Amendment and Debate - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael.
2021-01-22HouseHouse EFA Subject to Amendment and Debate - Amendment by Representative Probst was rejected. Yea: 40 Nay: 84
2021-01-22HouseHouse EFA Subject to Amendment and Debate - Motion to Amend offered by Representative Probst.
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by
2021-01-15HouseHouse Hearing: Friday, January 15, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2021-01-12HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-01-12HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/hcr5003/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hcr5003_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hcr5003_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hcr5003_h_0635.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hcr5003_h_0533.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hcr5003_h_0628.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hcr5003_h_0608.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hcr5003_s_0685.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hcr5003_s_0674.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hcr5003_s_0692.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hcr5003_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/summary_hcr_5003_2021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210122100142_349927/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210122101937_968258/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210122113106_318542/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210128153656_135603/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210128155024_116589/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210128161142_902585/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210128171734_032316/

Bill Comments

feedback