KS HB2784 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for payroll deductions for indemnity insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for payroll deductions for indemnity insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Gartner was rejected - Yea: 48 Nay: 76 (Y: 48 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Died in Senate Committee
2018-04-03SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2018-04-02SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2018-04-02HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2018-03-29HouseHouse Representative Sutton raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Gartner was rejected Yea: 48 Nay: 76
2018-03-29HouseHouse Representative Sutton raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Gartner
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on General Government Budget
2018-03-21HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 21, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 218-N
2018-03-16HouseHouse Referred to Committee on General Government Budget
2018-03-16HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback