KS HB2784 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for payroll deductions for indemnity insurance.
Title
Providing for payroll deductions for indemnity insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Gartner was rejected - Yea: 48 Nay: 76 (Y: 48 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Gartner was rejected - Yea: 48 Nay: 76 (Y: 48 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-04-02 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-03-29 | House | House Representative Sutton raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Gartner was rejected Yea: 48 Nay: 76 |
2018-03-29 | House | House Representative Sutton raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Gartner |
2018-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on General Government Budget |
2018-03-21 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 21, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 218-N |
2018-03-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on General Government Budget |
2018-03-16 | House | House Introduced |