KS HB2780 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the county to pay costs associated with certain property tax appeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the county to pay costs associated with certain property tax appeals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Died in Committee
2018-03-20HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 20, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S
2018-03-15HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2018-03-15HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback