KS HB2760 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 24, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 24, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prescribing documentation requirements to determine eligibility for any benefit derived from a service-connected disability, requiring that federal disability determinations for veterans be probative, establishing the Kansas office of veterans services, updating references and corresponding changes relating to the transfer of powers and duties from the Kansas commission on veterans affairs office to the Kansas office of veterans services, updating the veterans claims assistance program to include references to veterans affairs medical centers and cross-accreditation requirements, modifying the definition of veteran and disabled veteran, clarifying disability evaluations for benefits granted to disabled veterans and updating the definition of armed forces to include the space force.
Title
Prescribing documentation requirements to determine eligibility for any benefit derived from a service-connected disability, requiring that federal disability determinations for veterans be probative, establishing the Kansas office of veterans services, updating references and corresponding changes relating to the transfer of powers and duties from the Kansas commission on veterans affairs office to the Kansas office of veterans services, updating the veterans claims assistance program to include references to veterans affairs medical centers and cross-accreditation requirements, modifying the definition of veteran and disabled veteran, clarifying disability evaluations for benefits granted to disabled veterans and updating the definition of armed forces to include the space force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 24, 2024 |
2024-04-25 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-25 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Billinger, Senator Claeys and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees |
2024-03-27 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Ellis , Representative Dodson and Representative Weigel as conferees |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-02-20 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2024-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2024-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2024-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military |
2024-02-08 | House | House Introduced |