KS HB2756 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning sales and use tax; remote retailers; nexus; marketplace facilitators; digital products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning sales and use tax; remote retailers; nexus; marketplace facilitators; digital products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Died on Calendar
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
2018-03-01HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S
2018-02-22HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2018-02-22HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback