KS HB2749 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sales tax authority for Jackson county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax authority for Jackson county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 108 Nay: 10 (Y: 108 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Died in Senate Committee
2018-03-20SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2018-03-19SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2018-03-16HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 108 Nay: 10
2018-03-16HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, March 15, 2018
2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
2018-02-28HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 28, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S
2018-02-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2018-02-14HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback