KS HB2745 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a task force that would draft a transition bill of rights to educate parents and students regarding their rights and resources related to transition services for students receiving special education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a task force that would draft a transition bill of rights to educate parents and students regarding their rights and resources related to transition services for students receiving special education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Died in Committee
2018-02-19HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Children and Seniors
2018-02-16HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Children and Seniors; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-15HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 218-N
2018-02-09HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors
2018-02-09HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback