KS HB2736 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - House Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the department of administration to issue bonds to construct and equip a department of health and environment laboratory on parking lot No. 4 of the capitol complex in Topeka; current laboratory identified and sold as state surplus real estate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the department of administration to issue bonds to construct and equip a department of health and environment laboratory on parking lot No. 4 of the capitol complex in Topeka; current laboratory identified and sold as state surplus real estate.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED
2020-03-18HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED
2020-03-09HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-03-09HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback