KS HB2734 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reinstating the social worker applicant option for board-approved postgraduate supervised experience and allowing master's and clinical level licensees to take the baccalaureate addiction counselor test.
Title
Reinstating the social worker applicant option for board-approved postgraduate supervised experience and allowing master's and clinical level licensees to take the baccalaureate addiction counselor test.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-03-21 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2022-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 14, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2022-03-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2022-03-08 | House | House Introduced |