KS HB2734 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Making changes to the Kansas sexually violent predator program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making changes to the Kansas sexually violent predator program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Died in Senate Committee
2018-04-02SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-29SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2018-03-29HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
2018-03-29HouseHouse Engrossed on Wednesday, March 28, 2018
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-06HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N
2018-02-14HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-13HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-09HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-09HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback