KS HB2733 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring homeowners' associations to conduct certain home repairs in accordance with applicable codes and standards and providing for enforcement by civil penalties in an action brought by the attorney general.
Title
Requiring homeowners' associations to conduct certain home repairs in accordance with applicable codes and standards and providing for enforcement by civil penalties in an action brought by the attorney general.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government |
2024-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2024-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-02-07 | House | House Introduced |