KS HB2731 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; authorizing a manufacturer licensee to hold a drinking establishment license.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; authorizing a manufacturer licensee to hold a drinking establishment license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2018-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-02-08 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2731/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2731_00_0000.pdf |