KS HB2717 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting any municipality from preventing the enforcement of federal immigration laws, requiring municipal law enforcement agencies to provide written notice to each law enforcement officer of the officer's duty to cooperate with state and federal agencies in the enforcement of immigration laws and requiring any municipal identification card to state on its face that it is not valid for state identification.
Title
Prohibiting any municipality from preventing the enforcement of federal immigration laws, requiring municipal law enforcement agencies to provide written notice to each law enforcement officer of the officer's duty to cooperate with state and federal agencies in the enforcement of immigration laws and requiring any municipal identification card to state on its face that it is not valid for state identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 29 Nay: 10 (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 84 Nay: 38 (Y: 84 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 84 Nay: 38 (Y: 84 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 29 Nay: 10 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to advance to Final Action subject to amendments, debate and roll call. Motion carried. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 29, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-03-28 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 23, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 23, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-03-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 84 Nay: 38 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2022-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-02-22 | House | House Introduced |