KS HB2702 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Registration of meteorological evaluation towers.
Title
Registration of meteorological evaluation towers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2018-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 582-N |
2018-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2018-02-07 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2702/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2702_00_0000.pdf |