KS HB2701 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 24, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 24, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2701 by Committee on Utilities - Creating the statewide broadband expansion planning task force.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2701 by Committee on Utilities - Creating the statewide broadband expansion planning task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-07 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 117 Nay: 3 (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 16, 2018 |
2018-04-07 | House | House Reengrossed on Saturday, April 7, 2018 |
2018-04-07 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 117 Nay: 3 |
2018-04-07 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-04-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Petersen and Senator Hawk appointed as conferees |
2018-04-02 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Seiwert , Representative Garber and Representative Kuether as conferees |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Utilities |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Wednesday, March 21, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 548-S |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 20, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 548-S |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Bill now in Committee on Utilities |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 09, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred separately to Committee on Commerce and Committee on Utilities |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-28 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, February 23, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Gartner was adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Gartner |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2018-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 582-N |
2018-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2018-02-07 | House | House Introduced |