KS HB2699 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring court services officers to assist with child in need of care cases when directed by a judge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring court services officers to assist with child in need of care cases when directed by a judge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 105 Nay: 20 (Y: 105 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED
2020-03-18SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED
2020-03-17SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2020-03-05SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-04SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2020-02-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 105 Nay: 20
2020-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2020-02-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-17HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 17, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2020-02-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-14HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback