KS HB2691 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 29, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 29, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the deadline for multi-year flex account applications.
Title
Extending the deadline for multi-year flex account applications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing and possible action: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Water and Environment |
2018-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 582-N |
2018-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Water and Environment |
2018-02-07 | House | House Introduced |