KS HB2682 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing private plaintiffs to bring an action under the Kansas false claims act.
Title
Allowing private plaintiffs to bring an action under the Kansas false claims act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED |
2020-03-17 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2020-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2682/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2682_00_0000.pdf |