KS HB2674 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a forfeiture of an appearance bond to be set aside in certain circumstances.
Title
Requiring a forfeiture of an appearance bond to be set aside in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 2 (Y: 121 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-03-16 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 2 |
2022-03-16 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 15, 2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be further amended and be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 3, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2022-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-23 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 14, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2022-02-11 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2022-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-09 | House | House Introduced |