KS HB2669 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State civil service board; transferred from the department of administration to the office of administrative hearings.
Title
State civil service board; transferred from the department of administration to the office of administrative hearings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 110 Nay: 13 (Y: 110 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2014-02-27 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 110 Nay: 13 |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Burroughs was rejected |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Burroughs |
2014-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2014-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 218-N |
2014-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on General Government Budget |
2014-02-12 | House | House Introduced |