KS HB2668 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax exemption for sales of farm products sold at farmers' markets.
Title
Sales tax exemption for sales of farm products sold at farmers' markets.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Pittman [D] | Rep. Stephanie Clayton [D] | Rep. Tim Hodge [D] | Rep. Eileen Horn [D] |
Rep. Jim Karleskint [R] | Rep. Adam Lusker [D] | Rep. Brett Parker [D] | Rep. Jason Probst [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2018-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2018-02-07 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2668/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2668_00_0000.pdf |