KS HB2667 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring law enforcement agencies to adopt policies requiring an investigation and public report be completed after officer-involved deaths.
Title
Requiring law enforcement agencies to adopt policies requiring an investigation and public report be completed after officer-involved deaths.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Croft [R] | Rep. John Resman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 18, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2020-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2667/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2667_00_0000.pdf |